Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 1364 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 6517 Week
» 141333 Month
» 343997 Year
» 3370850 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1780 |
m/e |
06/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8780 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7650 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2611 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
62611 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
D16 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H88 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 06/1923 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 01/01/1957 off Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1928 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
11/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
09/1944 |
Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
09/1944 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
09/1944 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/08/1946 |
Liverpool Street Station |
The loco. hauling the Scandinavian now carries a headboard on the smokebox-first time noted was 8780 on 13/8. The 'Hook' has in its formation two of the new L.N.E.R vestibule coaches with middle doors, easily picked out by their brown roofs. On 16/9 'J.67' 8591 was in charge of a very lengthy train of wagons proceeding along the marshes from Temple Mills, with more than 55 vehicles! |
SLS/194701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1923 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1780 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 26 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8780 |
|
|
11/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
11/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7650 but not taken up |
|
|
09/1944 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
|
|
09/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2611 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
23/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62611 |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
01/01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62611 from Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
02/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|