Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2093 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 16136 Week
» 81090 Month
» 283754 Year
» 3310607 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1548 |
m/e |
08/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4548 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7398 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
67398 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
250 |
Works Number |
1162 |
To Service |
During 08/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 04/11/1958 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1907 |
LTH |
|
Louth |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
40B |
|
Immingham |
4w/e |
15/12/1956 |
35A |
|
New England |
4w/e |
16/02/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/11/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/11/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1922 |
Condensers removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/08/1958 |
Peterborough MPD |
C12 67398 has been working the Stamford branch with the N5s and C12 67363 has arrived as spare; however N7s 69635/46 have replaced N5s and more are expected as the N5s are withdrawn. |
SLS/195810 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1548 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1162 |
|
|
09/1922 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
04/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4548 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7398 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Louth (LTH) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67398 |
|
|
15/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
16/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
11/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
04/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67398 |
|
|