Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4282 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17688 Week
» 70704 Month
» 190231 Year
» 3217084 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1539 |
m/e |
01/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4539 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7389 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
67389 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
234 |
Works Number |
1025 |
To Service |
During 01/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 15/04/1955 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 3 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
w/e |
27/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
w/e |
05/05/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/04/1955 |
ALLOC |
NEMPA |
|
4w/e |
23/04/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1921 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1539 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1025 |
|
|
11/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4539 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7389 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Louth (LTH) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67389 |
|
|
27/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
23/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
23/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
05/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
04/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
15/04/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67389 |
|
|