Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 392 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18195 Week
» 71211 Month
» 190738 Year
» 3217591 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1537 |
m/e |
12/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4537 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7387 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
67387 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
234 |
Works Number |
1023 |
To Service |
During 12/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 07/02/1955 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1922 |
Condensers removed |
10/1949 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1949 |
Doncaster Works |
Locomotives noted in the Paint Shop at the beginning of November included: Nos. 60030/91, 60109/11, 60891, 60900/38/40, 61208, 61819/91, 61906/53/87, 67379, 69527/47. No. 67387 has been fitted for 'Pull and Push' working. |
SLS/194912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1537 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1023 |
|
|
05/1922 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4537 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7387 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67387 |
|
|
19/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
25/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
13/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
02/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/02/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67387 |
|
|