Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 56 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17859 Week
» 70875 Month
» 190402 Year
» 3217255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
265 |
m/e |
07/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5265 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2904 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
C4 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
9233 |
Works Number |
4599 |
To Service |
During 07/1904 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1947 |
Service Life |
43 yrs , 5 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1904 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
12/1947 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
26/10/1946 |
ALLOC |
IMM |
Immingham |
on |
08/12/1946 |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
on |
14/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
IMM |
Immingham |
w/e |
29/11/1947 |
WDN |
IMM |
Immingham |
on |
16/12/1947 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 265 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4599 |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5265 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2904 |
|
|
12/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2904 |
|
|