Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3476 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16882 Week
» 69898 Month
» 189425 Year
» 3216278 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
192 |
m/e |
12/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5192 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2900 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
62900 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
C4 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
9034 |
Works Number |
4539 |
To Service |
During 12/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 09/11/1950 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1903 |
BOS |
|
Boston |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
09/11/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
on |
07/09/1947 |
ALLOC |
BOS |
Boston |
on |
14/09/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/11/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 192 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4539 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5192 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2900 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62900 but not taken up |
|
|
11/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/11/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2900 |
|
|