Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 73 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17876 Week
» 70892 Month
» 190419 Year
» 3217272 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1460 |
|
10/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4460 |
|
25/07/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2890 |
|
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
263 |
Works Number |
1284 |
To Service |
During 10/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 27/10/1945 |
Service Life |
35 yrs , 27 dys |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1460 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1284 |
|
|
1917 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/03/1917. |
|
|
12/07/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1922. Dep: 30/09/1922. |
|
|
13/05/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1924. Dep: 25/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4460
|
|
|
25/08/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1926. Dep: 23/12/1926. |
|
|
17/03/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1928. Dep: 09/06/1928. |
|
|
20/07/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1929. Dep: 31/08/1929. |
|
|
02/05/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931. |
|
|
24/12/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1932. Dep: 04/02/1933. |
|
|
08/06/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1935. Dep: 06/07/1935. |
|
|
30/09/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
24/10/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1936. Dep: 28/11/1936. |
|
|
26/11/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
13/08/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1938. Dep: 03/09/1938. |
|
|
17/08/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1940. Dep: 21/09/1940. |
|
|
08/11/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1941. Dep: 10/01/1942. |
|
|
27/11/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1943. Dep: 18/12/1943. |
|
|
13/10/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/10/1945. Dep: 13/10/1945. |
|
|
27/10/1945 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4460 |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2890 but not taken up |
|
|