04/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1443 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1191 |
|
|
1914 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: ?/05/1914. |
|
|
1920 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/02/1920. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
10/10/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1922. Dep: 23/02/1923. |
|
|
05/12/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1924. Dep: 14/03/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4443
|
|
|
07/02/1925 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
18/04/1925 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) |
|
|
28/04/1925 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
04/12/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1926. Dep: 02/04/1927. |
|
|
30/11/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1928. Dep: 09/02/1929. |
|
|
24/08/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/08/1929. Dep: 12/10/1929. |
|
|
13/02/1930 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) |
|
|
24/03/1930 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
16/05/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931. |
|
|
11/03/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 22/04/1933. |
|
|
24/02/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934. |
|
|
13/10/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1934. Dep: 17/11/1934. |
|
|
09/02/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
30/01/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 06/03/1937. |
|
|
03/02/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940. |
|
|
22/06/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/06/1940. Dep: 20/07/1940. |
|
|
22/02/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1941. Dep: 29/03/1941. |
|
|
07/08/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943. |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2873 |
|
|
13/04/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/04/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946. |
|
|
02/05/1946 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2873 |
|
|