Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1579 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14985 Week
» 68001 Month
» 187528 Year
» 3214381 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1442 |
|
05/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4442 |
|
23/08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2872 |
|
03/02/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
255 |
Works Number |
1193 |
To Service |
During 05/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 23/01/1947 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1908 |
KX |
|
Kings Cross |
on |
21/08/1934 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/01/1947 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1442 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1193 |
|
|
1914 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: ?/04/1914. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/03/1921. |
|
|
11/10/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1922. Dep: 27/01/1923. |
|
|
28/05/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1924. Dep: 23/08/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4442
|
|
|
23/08/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1926. Dep: 27/01/1927. |
|
|
27/08/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1928. Dep: 08/11/1928. |
|
|
26/04/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1930. Dep: 07/06/1930. |
|
|
15/08/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1931. Dep: 10/10/1931. |
|
|
31/12/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1932. Dep: 11/02/1933. |
|
|
10/03/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1934. Dep: 28/04/1934. |
|
|
21/08/1934 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
12/10/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935. |
|
|
12/03/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1938. Dep: 09/04/1938. |
|
|
01/04/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939. |
|
|
25/07/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1942. Dep: 29/08/1942. |
|
|
08/07/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1944. Dep: 29/07/1944. |
|
|
03/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2872 |
|
|
17/11/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/11/1946. Dep: 17/11/1946. |
|
|
23/01/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2872 |
|
|