Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1807 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19610 Week
» 72626 Month
» 192153 Year
» 3219006 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1437 |
|
03/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4437 |
|
26/07/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2867 |
|
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
253 |
Works Number |
1186 |
To Service |
During 03/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 11/03/1944 |
Service Life |
36 yrs , 11 dys |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1437 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1186 |
|
|
1915 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: ?/12/1915. |
|
|
18/10/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1922. Dep: 10/02/1923. Work undertaken: Hulburd mechanical lubricator fitted
|
|
|
23/05/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1924. Dep: 26/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4437
|
|
|
10/08/1924 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
02/10/1925 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
23/10/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1925. Dep: 30/01/1926. |
|
|
05/02/1926 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) |
|
|
08/03/1927 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
28/01/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1928. Dep: 14/04/1928. |
|
|
10/11/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1928. Dep: 09/02/1929. |
|
|
16/02/1929 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
19/09/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1931. Dep: 24/10/1931. |
|
|
31/03/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1934. Dep: 12/05/1934. |
|
|
16/01/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937. |
|
|
26/02/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938. |
|
|
09/12/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1939. Dep: 20/01/1940. |
|
|
12/12/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1942. Dep: 16/01/1943. |
|
|
12/02/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/02/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944. |
|
|
11/03/1944 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4437 |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2867 but not taken up |
|
|