|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1911 | 04/1911 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1914 | 07/1914 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1916 | 11/1916 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1922 | 12/08/1922 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1923 | 03/03/1923 | 61 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1923 | 28/07/1923 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/09/1923 | 03/11/1923 | 59 days | Heavy | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1432N |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1924 | 30/08/1924 | 83 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4432 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1925 | 09/05/1925 | 115 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1927 | 08/08/1927 | 82 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1928 | 19/07/1928 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/12/1929 | 01/02/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1932 | 02/07/1932 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1934 | 15/12/1934 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1936 | 19/09/1936 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1938 | 19/03/1938 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1939 | 09/12/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1943 | 06/03/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/07/1945 | 14/07/1945 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1907 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1432 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1171 |
||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/04/1911. | ||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: ?/07/1914. | ||
1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/11/1916. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
08/08/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1922. Dep: 12/08/1922. | ||
02/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/01/1923. Dep: 03/03/1923. | ||
13/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1923. Dep: 28/07/1923. | ||
06/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/09/1923. Dep: 03/11/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1432N |
||
09/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1924. Dep: 30/08/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4432 |
||
15/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1925. Dep: 09/05/1925. | ||
19/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1927. Dep: 08/08/1927. | ||
18/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1928. Dep: 19/07/1928. | ||
28/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1929. Dep: 01/02/1930. | ||
28/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1932. Dep: 02/07/1932. | ||
10/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1934. Dep: 15/12/1934. | ||
15/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1936. Dep: 19/09/1936. | ||
26/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938. | ||
28/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939. | ||
06/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943. | ||
25/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
14/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 14/07/1945. Dep: 14/07/1945. | ||
26/07/1945 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4432 | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 2862 but not taken up |