Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1485 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14891 Week
» 67907 Month
» 187434 Year
» 3214287 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1431 |
|
06/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4431 |
|
22/03/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2861 |
|
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
249 |
Works Number |
1154 |
To Service |
During 06/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 21/10/1944 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1907 |
NWE |
|
New England |
on |
28/05/1938 |
KX |
|
Kings Cross |
on |
02/06/1943 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/10/1944 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1431 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1154 |
|
|
1913 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: ?/07/1913. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
1920 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/03/1920. |
|
|
01/12/1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1921. Dep: 01/07/1922. |
|
|
26/11/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1923. Dep: 22/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4431
|
|
|
01/09/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1925. Dep: 19/12/1925. |
|
|
22/04/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1927. Dep: 11/07/1927. |
|
|
19/06/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1928. Dep: 29/09/1928. |
|
|
27/09/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1930. Dep: 01/11/1930. |
|
|
24/09/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1932. Dep: 05/11/1932. |
|
|
22/07/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/07/1933. Dep: 29/07/1933. |
|
|
08/09/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1934. Dep: 13/10/1934. |
|
|
24/10/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1936. Dep: 21/11/1936. |
|
|
28/05/1938 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
21/10/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939. |
|
|
28/09/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/09/1940. Dep: 02/11/1940. |
|
|
11/07/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1942. Dep: 15/08/1942. |
|
|
02/06/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
30/09/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 30/09/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944. |
|
|
21/10/1944 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4431 |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2861 but not taken up |
|
|