05/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1418 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1116 |
|
|
1911 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/11/1911. |
|
|
1917 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/06/1917. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
05/07/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1922. Dep: 09/12/1922. |
|
|
27/08/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/08/1923. Dep: 03/11/1923. |
|
|
24/02/1924 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
14/10/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1924. Dep: 17/01/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4418
|
|
|
25/05/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1926. Dep: 29/09/1926. |
|
|
28/01/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/01/1927. Dep: 09/02/1927. |
|
|
11/03/1927 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
22/10/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 27/03/1928. |
|
|
02/11/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929. |
|
|
02/05/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 18/07/1931. |
|
|
25/02/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1933. Dep: 08/04/1933. |
|
|
15/12/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1934. Dep: 19/01/1935. |
|
|
19/12/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1936. Dep: 23/01/1937. |
|
|
17/07/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/07/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937. |
|
|
20/11/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1937. Dep: 04/12/1937. |
|
|
17/12/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1938. Dep: 28/01/1939. |
|
|
21/12/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/12/1940. Dep: 01/02/1941. |
|
|
06/09/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1941. Dep: 01/11/1941. |
|
|
24/07/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943. |
|
|
18/03/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/03/1944. Dep: 08/04/1944. |
|
|
27/01/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 27/01/1945. Dep: 27/01/1945. |
|
|
20/02/1945 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4418 |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2848 but not taken up |
|
|