06/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 282 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1042 |
|
|
1908 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: ?/07/1908. |
|
|
1911 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/11/1911. |
|
|
1917 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/08/1917. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
23/12/1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/12/1921. Dep: 15/04/1922. |
|
|
10/01/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1923. Dep: 19/05/1923. |
|
|
31/01/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/01/1924. Dep: 31/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3282
|
|
|
15/06/1924 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
15/04/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1926. Dep: 04/08/1926. |
|
|
28/02/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1928. Dep: 02/06/1928. |
|
|
25/01/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930. |
|
|
20/08/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1932. Dep: 29/10/1932. |
|
|
29/09/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1934. Dep: 03/11/1934. |
|
|
10/10/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1936. Dep: 07/11/1936. |
|
|
05/07/1938 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
31/12/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1938. Dep: 11/02/1939. |
|
|
26/10/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940. |
|
|
17/07/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1942. Dep: 15/08/1942. |
|
|
14/10/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944. |
|
|
30/10/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/10/1944. Dep: 10/02/1945. |
|
|
17/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2811 |
|
|
17/09/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/09/1946. Dep: 17/09/1946. |
|
|
20/10/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
30/01/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2811 |
|
|