|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1908 | 05/1908 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1915 | 08/05/1915 | General | Converted to 4-cylinders and Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1922 | 15/07/1922 | 69 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1923 | 30/06/1923 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1924 | 02/08/1924 | 79 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3279 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1925 | 02/04/1925 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1925 | 25/01/1926 | 252 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1927 | 10/02/1928 | 112 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1930 | 05/07/1930 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1932 | 08/10/1932 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1934 | 03/03/1934 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/12/1934 | 09/02/1935 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/09/1936 | 30/04/1938 | 603 days | General | Converted to 2-cylinders |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1938 | 27/08/1938 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1940 | 23/03/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1940 | 30/11/1940 | 64 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1942 | 20/06/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1942 | 28/11/1942 | 8 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1943 | 08/05/1943 | 36 days | Light Repair | Derailed at Hitchin |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/07/1944 | 26/08/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1945 | 02/06/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1946 | 10/10/1947 | 361 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1948 | 29/01/1948 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Doncaster Works | Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. | SLS/194805 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 279 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1037 |
||
1908 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: ?/05/1908. | ||
1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 08/05/1915. Work undertaken: Converted to 4-cylinders and Superheated boiler fitted |
||
08/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1922. Dep: 15/07/1922. | ||
05/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/06/1923. Dep: 30/06/1923. | ||
16/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1924. Dep: 02/08/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3279 |
||
23/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1925. Dep: 02/04/1925. | ||
19/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1925. Dep: 25/01/1926. | ||
22/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 10/02/1928. | ||
17/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1930. Dep: 05/07/1930. | ||
06/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1932. Dep: 08/10/1932. | ||
03/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/02/1934. Dep: 03/03/1934. | ||
22/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1934. Dep: 09/02/1935. | ||
12/02/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
05/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1936. Dep: 30/04/1938. Work undertaken: Converted to 2-cylinders |
||
23/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/08/1938. Dep: 27/08/1938. | ||
17/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1940. Dep: 23/03/1940. | ||
28/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/09/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940. | ||
16/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1942. Dep: 20/06/1942. | ||
21/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/11/1942. Dep: 28/11/1942. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
03/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943. Work undertaken: Derailed at Hitchin |
||
29/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1944. Dep: 26/08/1944. | ||
19/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/05/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945. | ||
17/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2808 | ||
15/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1946. Dep: 10/10/1947. | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 62808 but not taken up | ||
29/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 29/01/1948. Dep: 29/01/1948. | ||
14/02/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2808 |