|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1908 | 08/1908 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1912 | 10/1912 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1920 | 06/1920 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1923 | 08/07/1923 | 126 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1925 | 04/04/1925 | 88 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3274 |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1926 | 22/04/1927 | 138 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1928 | 10/01/1929 | 70 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1930 | 08/03/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1931 | 31/10/1931 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1933 | 06/01/1934 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/02/1936 | 11/04/1936 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1938 | 23/07/1938 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1940 | 11/05/1940 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/06/1943 | 31/07/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1946 | 14/04/1946 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 274 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1032 |
||
1908 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: ?/08/1908. | ||
1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: ?/10/1912. | ||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/06/1920. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
05/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1923. Dep: 08/07/1923. | ||
20/09/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
07/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1925. Dep: 04/04/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3274 |
||
06/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
06/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1926. Dep: 22/04/1927. | ||
02/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1928. Dep: 10/01/1929. | ||
01/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1930. Dep: 08/03/1930. | ||
19/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1931. Dep: 31/10/1931. | ||
02/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1933. Dep: 06/01/1934. | ||
29/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1936. Dep: 11/04/1936. | ||
11/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1938. Dep: 23/07/1938. | ||
17/02/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) | ||
16/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940. | ||
26/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 2803 but not taken up | ||
14/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 14/04/1946. Dep: 14/04/1946. | ||
02/05/1946 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3274 | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |