|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1908 | 03/1908 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1912 | 06/1912 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1918 | 08/1918 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1921 | 30/07/1921 | 146 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1923 | 22/12/1923 | 143 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 251N |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1924 | 07/03/1925 | 90 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3251 |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1925 | 20/06/1925 | 45 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/04/1926 | 28/05/1926 | 50 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1927 | 02/07/1927 | 90 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1929 | 06/04/1929 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1930 | 25/10/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1932 | 04/06/1932 | 85 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1934 | 17/03/1934 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1935 | 03/08/1935 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/12/1937 | 22/01/1938 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1940 | 02/11/1940 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1942 | 27/06/1942 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1943 | 22/05/1943 | 71 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1945 | 11/08/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1947 | 18/11/1947 | 1 day | General | For museum preservation |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/08/1947 | Doncaster Works | On 17/8 the following withdrawn locos. (still complete) were in the Works yard: 'D3' 2127/42/47; 'D2' 2171/86/91/96; 'Cl' 2800/12; '03' 3490/92; 'J3' 4155; 'C12' 7396 and Railcars R51909/13; whilst the following: 'D3' 2123, 'D2' 2181 and 'Dl' 2203 were observed stripped. Locos. awaiting Works or scrapping were: 'Bl' 1091, 'D3' 2139, 'D2' 2170/73, 'J3' 4121 and 'J55' 8319. W.D. No. 77003 was noted in the Erecting Shop. | SLS/194710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 251 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 991 |
||
1908 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: ?/03/1908. | ||
1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: ?/06/1912. | ||
1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: ?/08/1918. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
07/03/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1921. Dep: 30/07/1921. | ||
02/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 251N |
||
17/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
08/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1924. Dep: 07/03/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3251 |
||
07/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/05/1925. Dep: 20/06/1925. | ||
09/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/04/1926. Dep: 28/05/1926. | ||
04/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1927. Dep: 02/07/1927. | ||
02/07/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
09/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1929. Dep: 06/04/1929. | ||
20/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1930. Dep: 25/10/1930. | ||
12/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1932. Dep: 04/06/1932. | ||
17/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934. | ||
06/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1935. Dep: 03/08/1935. | ||
25/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1937. Dep: 22/01/1938. | ||
05/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1940. Dep: 02/11/1940. | ||
16/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/05/1942. Dep: 27/06/1942. | ||
13/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1943. Dep: 22/05/1943. | ||
07/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945. | ||
13/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2800 | ||
28/07/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2800 | ||
18/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1947. Dep: 18/11/1947. Work undertaken: For museum preservation |