Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 2893 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16299 Week
» 69315 Month
» 188842 Year
» 3215695 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2858 |
on |
28/05/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1658 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
61658 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
B17 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1668 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
Thu 28/05/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 03/12/1959 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys |
Information |
Swapped tenders with 2847 in 1936 thereby becoming a class B17/3 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/03/1959 |
Colchester shed closure |
Colchester shed is expected to close shortly, and its duties shared between Ipswich and Parkeston. In store are 61658/62. |
SLS/195905 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/05/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2858, name: THE ESSEX REGIMENT Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1668 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1658 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61658 |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
14/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
20/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
14/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
12/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
03/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61658 |
|
|