Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1689 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15095 Week
» 68111 Month
» 187638 Year
» 3214491 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2846 |
on |
23/08/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1646 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
61646 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
B17 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1632 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
Fri 23/08/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 09/01/1959 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
w/e |
12/10/1946 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
13/10/1956 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/01/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/08/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2846, name: GILWELL PARK Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1632 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1646 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61646 |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
01/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/01/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61646 |
|
|