Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4394 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17800 Week
» 70816 Month
» 190343 Year
» 3217196 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2840 |
on |
18/05/1933 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1640 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
61640 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
B17 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1567 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
Sat 18/05/1933 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 15/11/1958 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
18/05/1933 |
GOR |
|
Gorton |
m/e |
11/1935 |
CAM |
|
Cambridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/11/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
m/e |
03/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
19/10/1946 |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
on |
25/01/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/11/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/05/1933 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2840, name: SOMERLEYTON HALL Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1567 |
|
|
11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1640 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61640 |
|
|
11/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61640 |
|
|