Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3777 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17183 Week
» 70199 Month
» 189726 Year
» 3216579 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2834 |
on |
17/06/1931 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1634 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
61634 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
B17 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1528 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
Mon 17/06/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/08/1958 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
22/05/1954 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
5w/e |
31/03/1956 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/08/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1950 |
Doncaster Works |
Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 60020/43/54, 60133/41, 60512/39, 60820/65/67, 61083, 61634, 61822/24/61, 61947/85, 67713/24, 69444, 69505. A considerable number of 'Pacific' and 'V.2' Class locomotives are being fitted with A.T.C. gear, as part of the ex-G.N. main line has already been equipped with A.T.C. apparatus; this may be extended. |
SLS/195005 |
30/04/1950 |
Doncaster Works |
Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. |
SLS/195006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/06/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2834, name: HINCHINGBROOKE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1528 |
|
|
11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1634 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61634 |
|
|
21/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
08/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
04/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61634 |
|
|