|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1947 | Doncaster MPD | A number of withdrawn locos. are still lying at various sheds awaiting removal to Works for cutting up; amongst those recently seen were: at Doncaster, 'Cl' 2832/50/51/66/86 and 'J3' 4113; they were all in a deplorable condition. | SLS/194710 |
04/10/1958 | E.R. locomotive news | C12 67352 is now acting as Station pilot, Grantham and is ex-works, fully lined out; J52 68846 is ex-works, fully lined out at Hornsey; L.T.S.R. 4-4-2T 41969 is ex-works in unlined black at Plaistow; 61632, Belvoir Castle has been renamed Royal Sovereign and was ex-Stratford mid-October whilst 61671 was still in scrap yard with nameplates Royal Sovereign. | SLS/195811 |
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Old Works) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/05/1931 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2832, name: ROYAL SOVEREIGN (1958) Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1526 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) | ||
26/06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61632 | ||
17/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
02/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
02/02/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61632 |