Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1496 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14902 Week
» 67918 Month
» 187445 Year
» 3214298 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2826 |
on |
04/03/1931 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1626 |
on |
21/03/1946 |
British Railways |
61626 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
B17 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1520 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
Mon 04/03/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 11/01/1960 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
18/04/1959 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/01/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1945 |
Leeds Area |
Latest B.16/3 843 appeared on 2.5.p.m. Darlington-Leeds turn on 20/9. B.17 2826 was noted on 3/10 working north on a Class A Goods on the main line near Thirsk. N.13 2405 and J.21 1593 proceeded north through Ripon on 5/10 coupled together (1593 'dead') apparently going to works. The chief effect of the new timetables seems to have been a reduction in the loading of long distance passenger trains. The 9.20 a.m. Newcastle-Liverpool E.P. during the first eleven days of the new timetable consisted of 14-16 bogies, compared with 15-18 previously. It has now been cut to 12 daily and the train is still double-headed from Ripon to Leeds. During the summer the relief to this train usually was made up of 12-14 bogies, and was always worked by one engine! Ex-N.E. Z have been much in evidence on Neville Hill turns lately. Since 4/10 the following combinations have been noted on the 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool: 2204 & 4866; 2193, 2206 an 722 all piloting 2568 on different days; 2208 & 3648; and 729 & 211 on the 9.0 Liverpool-Newcastle: On 12/10 the relief 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool was worked by K.2 4651 with 10 bogies, and piloted from Ripon by A.6 688 bunker first. D.21 1245 which was awaiting works at the Darlington shed visit in July, has reappeared, and was first noted on 8/10, piloting D.20 1210 on the 9.40 a.m. Leeds to Middlesbrough (a regular double-headed working). |
SLS/194601 |
31/01/1956 |
York MPD (York station) |
December, 1955-January, 1956. On 28/12/55 60152 (64B), ex-works, was in York shed yard, and 60161 (64B) in similar circumstances on 5/1/56. 67764 (53B) was also at York on 28/12/55 en route for Darlington Works, whilst 67724 (30A) which had called at York, in rather poor condition, on 9/11/55, returned southward bound from Darlington Works on 12/1/56 in a more attractive state. On 29/12/55 new B.R. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106 from Doncaster was at York, with 76024 (52C) passing through for Doncaster Works. On the following day a very smart 60919 (61B) worked an up goods into Dringhouses during the course of running-in. from Darlington. On 4/1/56 44592 (5B) was an unusual visitor to York, whilst 63760 (54B) put in an appearance while on route for overhaul at Gorton. On the same day three very rusty and forlorn 'Sl' 0-8-4Ts were at York en route for scrapping at Darlington, namely 69900 (36A), 69902 (36B), 69904 (36B). 69900/04 were hauled in by 61188 (38A) in particularly smart trim. 69902 was still at York on the following day which was also marked by the unusual simultaneous appearance in York station of two 'B17s', 61626 (31A) and 61656 (32A); the former brought in the 7.20 a.m. Colchester to Newcastle train which has also recently produced Woodford V2s 60890 an 60915 instead of the more-usual Doncaster or March engine. On 12/1/56 unusual visitors were 43088 (35A), and from the L.M.R. 44692 (24A) and 45211 (25G). The beginning of the year saw the number of 'J25s' in store at York south shed reduced to two, i.e., 65675 an 65677, but the ex-L.M.S.. shed still contains 69864 (50G), 62702 (50A), 62746 (50D) and 62761 (50D) in store. 62730 (50A) is still dumped out of service in the north shed yard but 62345 is at last showing signs of awakening from her-very prolonged hibernation. |
SLS/195605 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/03/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2826, name: BRANCEPETH CASTLE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1520 |
|
|
21/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1626 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61626 |
|
|
06/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
11/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61626 |
|
|