Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 647 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14053 Week
» 67069 Month
» 186596 Year
» 3213449 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2820 |
on |
12/11/1930 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1620 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
61620 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
12/11/1930 |
CLUMBER |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
B17 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1514 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
Mon 12/11/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 25/01/1960 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
19/10/1946 |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
w/e |
01/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
4w/e |
25/12/1948 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
m/e |
30/06/1950 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
18/04/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/01/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/11/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2820, name: CLUMBER Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1514 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1620 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61620 |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
25/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61620 |
|
|