Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 2 Online
» 329 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18132 Week
» 71148 Month
» 190675 Year
» 3217528 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2814 |
on |
23/10/1930 |
British Railways |
61614 |
4w/e |
25/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley / E. Thompson |
Class |
B2 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1508 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
Mon 23/10/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 08/06/1959 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
23/10/1930 |
COL |
|
Colchester |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31A |
|
Cambridge |
4w/e |
17/11/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/06/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
10/11/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/06/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/10/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2814, name: CASTLE HEDINGHAM Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1508 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61614 |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
06/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
08/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61614 |
|
|