|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 23/07/1925 | 04/08/1925 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/05/1926 | 21/09/1926 | 142 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/01/1930 | 27/01/1930 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1933 | 20/04/1933 | 42 days | General | Boiler number D983 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1935 | 05/11/1935 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2707 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1938 | 11/06/1938 | 51 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1940 | 16/10/1940 | 33 days | General | Boiler number D1592 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1943 | 09/12/1943 | 153 days | General | Boiler number 3423 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 01/03/1945 | 23/03/1945 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1945 | 06/09/1945 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/02/1946 | 09/03/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1947 | 10/05/1947 | 13 days | General | Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3581 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1947 | 13/11/1947 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/07/1948 | 05/08/1948 | 30 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61468 |
||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1948 | 14/10/1948 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/08/1949 | 21/10/1949 | 75 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1949 | 23/11/1949 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 3506 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1949 | 07/12/1949 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1952 | 24/05/1952 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24055 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1953 | 12/06/1953 | 45 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1953 | 05/10/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1954 | 26/11/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1955 | 19/03/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24102 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1955 | 23/03/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1957 | 30/03/1957 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24049 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1957 | 03/04/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1958 | 03/10/1958 | 30 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1960 | 28/01/1961 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 24007 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1963 | 26/03/1963 | 30 days | Heavy Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1947 | General | The 2.5 p.m. Darlington to Leeds train (return from Leeds at 6.45 p.m.) continues as a running-in train for locos. ex-North Road Works. Since the appearance of 'V2' No. 836 (HAY) on 1/4, the consecutive appearance of new 'Bl' on this turn has been broken; No. 836 having worked intermittently on the train up to 2/6-an unusually long running-in period for Scottish Area 'V2,' which usually work this train only once or twice. The latest 'Bl' noted are Nos. 1026 on 29/4, 1022 on 16/5, and 1028 on 28/5. Nos. 1024/7 have not yet appeared on this turn. Two new conversions are No. 1468 to 'B16/3' and No. 1607 to 'B2,' and which first worked this train on 23/5 and 27/5 respectively. | SLS/194708 |
18/01/1964 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1385 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1221 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
23/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/07/1925. Dep: 04/08/1925. | ||
03/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1926. Dep: 21/09/1926. | ||
14/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1930. Dep: 27/01/1930. | ||
27/11/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1933. Dep: 20/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D983 (Diagram 49) |
||
03/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1935. Dep: 05/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2707 (Diagram 49) |
||
22/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1938. Dep: 11/06/1938. | ||
01/06/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
14/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1940. Dep: 16/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1592 (Diagram 49) |
||
10/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1943. Dep: 09/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3423 (Diagram 49A) |
||
01/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/03/1945. Dep: 23/03/1945. | ||
13/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/08/1945. Dep: 06/09/1945. | ||
22/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/02/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946. | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1468 | ||
28/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1947. Dep: 10/05/1947. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3581 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/11/1947. Dep: 13/11/1947. | ||
07/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1948. Dep: 05/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61468 |
||
01/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/10/1948. Dep: 14/10/1948. | ||
08/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1949. Dep: 21/10/1949. | ||
28/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1949. Dep: 23/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3506 (Diagram 49A) |
||
01/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/12/1949. Dep: 07/12/1949. | ||
02/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1952. Dep: 24/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24055 (Diagram 49A) |
||
29/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1953. Dep: 12/06/1953. | ||
05/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/10/1953. Dep: 05/10/1953. | ||
23/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/11/1954. Dep: 26/11/1954. | ||
18/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1955. Dep: 19/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24102 (Diagram 49A) |
||
21/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/03/1955. Dep: 23/03/1955. | ||
07/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1957. Dep: 30/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24049 (Diagram 49A) |
||
01/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/04/1957. Dep: 03/04/1957. | ||
04/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 04/09/1958. Dep: 03/10/1958. | ||
20/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1960. Dep: 28/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24007 (Diagram 49A) |
||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
25/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/02/1963. Dep: 26/03/1963. | ||
16/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61468 from Mirfield (56D) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |