|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 26/01/1926 | 30/04/1926 | 95 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1928 | 09/01/1929 | 73 days | General | Boiler number D1525 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1929 | 19/07/1929 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1931 | 16/07/1931 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1932 | 07/03/1932 | 42 days | General | Boiler number D1438 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1934 | 14/07/1934 | 31 days | General | Boiler number D1492 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1936 | 08/08/1936 | 51 days | General | Boiler number D1623 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1936 | 18/08/1936 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1939 | 31/05/1939 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 2878 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1941 | 30/10/1941 | 39 days | General | Boiler number D1566 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1944 | 07/12/1944 | 79 days | General | Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3492 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 26/01/1946 | 12/02/1946 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1947 | 31/05/1947 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3585 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 05/08/1948 | 18/08/1948 | 14 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61454 |
||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1949 | 13/01/1950 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3589 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1952 | 26/04/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24056 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1952 | 01/05/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1954 | 03/07/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24049 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1956 | 05/10/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24021 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1958 | 12/12/1958 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 24017 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1961 | 20/01/1962 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 24033 (Diagram 49A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/09/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1371 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1207 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
26/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1926. Dep: 30/04/1926. | ||
29/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1928. Dep: 09/01/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1525 (Diagram 49) |
||
27/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
08/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/07/1929. Dep: 19/07/1929. | ||
14/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1931. Dep: 16/07/1931. | ||
26/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1932. Dep: 07/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1438 (Diagram 49) |
||
14/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1934. Dep: 14/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1492 (Diagram 49) |
||
19/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1623 (Diagram 49) |
||
10/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/08/1936. Dep: 18/08/1936. | ||
24/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1939. Dep: 31/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2878 (Diagram 49) |
||
11/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
22/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1941. Dep: 30/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1566 (Diagram 49) |
||
20/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1944. Dep: 07/12/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3492 (Diagram 49A) |
||
26/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/01/1946. Dep: 12/02/1946. | ||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1454 | ||
25/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3585 (Diagram 49A) |
||
05/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/08/1948. Dep: 18/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61454 |
||
12/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1949. Dep: 13/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3589 (Diagram 49A) |
||
02/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1952. Dep: 26/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24056 (Diagram 49A) |
||
28/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/04/1952. Dep: 01/05/1952. | ||
31/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24049 (Diagram 49A) |
||
04/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1956. Dep: 05/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24021 (Diagram 49A) |
||
28/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1958. Dep: 12/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24017 (Diagram 49A) |
||
13/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1961. Dep: 20/01/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24033 (Diagram 49A) |
||
29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61454 from York (North) (50A) | ||
09/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |