|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 17/07/1925 | 30/11/1925 | 137 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1928 | 07/09/1928 | 78 days | General | Boiler number D1029 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1930 | 08/03/1930 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1930 | 27/06/1930 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1931 | 05/06/1931 | 53 days | General | Boiler number D1133 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1934 | 03/04/1934 | 33 days | General | Boiler number D1529 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1936 | 09/04/1936 | 49 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1937 | 24/06/1937 | 165 days | General | Rebuilt to class B16/2 Boiler number 24060 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1938 | 15/11/1938 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1939 | 12/06/1939 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1939 | 01/07/1939 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1941 | 06/05/1941 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3165 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1943 | 16/03/1943 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3049 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1946 | 22/03/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 30/08/1946 | 19/09/1946 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1947 | 07/11/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3164 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 20/12/1948 | 11/01/1949 | 23 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61435 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1950 | 09/09/1950 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24001 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1950 | 12/09/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1952 | 23/01/1953 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 24058 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1953 | 10/02/1953 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1955 | 11/03/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24028 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1957 | 06/07/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24031 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1959 | 05/11/1959 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 24088 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1963 | 14/03/1963 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24101 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1963 | 11/04/1963 | 1 day | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/07/1957 | Darlington Works | On the 10th July, D49/2 62727, B16/2 61435 and J26 65755 were noted repainted with the new emblem. There were no engines in the scrap yard waiting cutting up and all that could be seen were the wheels of A5 tank 69833. On Wednesday, 21st August, B1 61131 re-painted ex works was observed at Hett Mill working north on a goods about noon. In the afternoon, B1 61080 also repainted ex works was observed at Cowton working a south bound goods. On the same day, V1 67674, V2 60938 and O7 90469 were noted outside Darlington Works having been overhauled and repainted. In the sidings across Whessoe Road from the works, V2 60914, D49/1 62713, J77 68426 and D20 62387 were observed standing dead. In the scrap yard, T1 69916 was in course of being cut up, only the frames and wheels remaining. Diesel trains are working some services between Darlington and Richmond. With the commencement of the Winter timetable, further diesel trains are expected to be allocated to the Newcastle-Middlesbrough services. | SLS/195709 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1922 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2364 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1173 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
17/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1925. Dep: 30/11/1925. | ||
22/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1928. Dep: 07/09/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1029 (Diagram 49) |
||
18/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1930. Dep: 08/03/1930. | ||
24/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1930. Dep: 27/06/1930. | ||
14/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1931. Dep: 05/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1133 (Diagram 49) |
||
02/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1934. Dep: 03/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1529 (Diagram 49) |
||
21/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1936. Dep: 09/04/1936. | ||
11/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1937. Dep: 24/06/1937. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B16/2 Boiler number 24060 (Diagram 49) |
||
04/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1938. Dep: 15/11/1938. | ||
22/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 12/06/1939. | ||
13/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/06/1939. Dep: 01/07/1939. | ||
24/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1941. Dep: 06/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3165 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1943. Dep: 16/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3049 (Diagram 49A) |
||
09/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 49A) |
||
07/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1946. Dep: 22/03/1946. | ||
30/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/08/1946. Dep: 19/09/1946. | ||
10/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1435 | ||
03/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1947. Dep: 07/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3164 (Diagram 49A) |
||
20/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/12/1948. Dep: 11/01/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61435 |
||
15/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1950. Dep: 09/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24001 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/09/1950. Dep: 12/09/1950. | ||
18/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1952. Dep: 23/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24058 (Diagram 49A) |
||
27/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/01/1953. Dep: 10/02/1953. | ||
10/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1955. Dep: 11/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24028 (Diagram 49A) |
||
04/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24031 (Diagram 49A) |
||
02/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1959. Dep: 05/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24088 (Diagram 49A) |
||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
05/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1963. Dep: 14/03/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24101 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1963. Dep: 11/04/1963. | ||
21/07/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61435 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
02/11/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |