|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 26/03/1924 | 17/06/1924 | 84 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/01/1927 | 21/04/1927 | 95 days | General | Boiler number D1048 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 04/08/1927 | 08/08/1927 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/04/1928 | 24/05/1928 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/05/1929 | 22/05/1929 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/08/1929 | 08/11/1929 | 93 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1930 | 10/10/1930 | 60 days | General | Boiler number D1442 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1932 | 14/10/1932 | 45 days | General | Boiler number D1566 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1935 | 07/03/1936 | 82 days | General | Boiler number D1214 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1939 | 24/03/1939 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2268 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1939 | 24/04/1939 | 27 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1941 | 17/06/1941 | 40 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1942 | 04/03/1942 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1943 | 03/02/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1945 | 05/06/1945 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 240]2 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/08/1945 | 02/08/1945 | 2 days | Light Repair | Water scoop refitted |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/06/1946 | 05/07/1946 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1947 | 30/01/1948 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3051 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR (Interim) number E1423 |
||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1952 | 09/04/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 24054 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61423 |
||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1954 | 23/10/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24020 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1954 | 28/10/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1955 | 22/12/1955 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1957 | 04/10/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24064 (Diagram 49A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1951 | Locomotives still not renumbered | Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). | SLS/195108 |
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) | Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). | SLS/195206 |
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 928 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
26/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1924. Dep: 17/06/1924. | ||
17/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1927. Dep: 21/04/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1048 (Diagram 49) |
||
04/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/08/1927. Dep: 08/08/1927. | ||
25/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/04/1928. Dep: 24/05/1928. | ||
15/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/05/1929. Dep: 22/05/1929. | ||
01/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
08/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1929. Dep: 08/11/1929. | ||
12/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1930. Dep: 10/10/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1442 (Diagram 49) |
||
31/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1932. Dep: 14/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1566 (Diagram 49) |
||
17/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1935. Dep: 07/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1214 (Diagram 49) |
||
09/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1939. Dep: 24/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2268 (Diagram 49) |
||
29/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/03/1939. Dep: 24/04/1939. | ||
06/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
09/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1941. Dep: 17/06/1941. | ||
29/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1942. Dep: 04/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 49A) |
||
20/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1943. Dep: 03/02/1943. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
23/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1945. Dep: 05/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 240]2 (Diagram 49A) |
||
01/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/08/1945. Dep: 02/08/1945. Work undertaken: Water scoop refitted |
||
29/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/06/1946. Dep: 05/07/1946. | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1423 | ||
18/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1947. Dep: 30/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3051 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR (Interim) number E1423 |
||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
19/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1952. Dep: 09/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24054 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61423 |
||
27/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1954. Dep: 23/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24020 (Diagram 49A) |
||
25/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/10/1954. Dep: 28/10/1954. | ||
06/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/12/1955. Dep: 22/12/1955. | ||
06/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1957. Dep: 04/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24064 (Diagram 49A) |
||
25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61423 from York (North) (50A) | ||
11/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |