|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 13/07/1925 | 28/11/1925 | 139 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1927 | 11/02/1928 | 92 days | General | Boiler number D1117 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1929 | 08/02/1930 | 62 days | General | Boiler number D1172 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1933 | 12/05/1933 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1935 | 10/01/1936 | 54 days | General | Boiler number D1038 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1937 | 08/10/1937 | 88 days | General | Boiler number D1125 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1939 | 03/08/1939 | 84 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1940 | 20/06/1940 | 25 days | General | Boiler number D1614 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1941 | 04/03/1941 | 27 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1942 | 24/09/1942 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 17/07/1943 | 14/08/1943 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1944 | 15/04/1944 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 05/11/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1946 | 09/05/1946 | 42 days | General | Boiler number D1610 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1947 | 23/10/1947 | 48 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1949 | 31/03/1949 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR 61422 |
||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1951 | 24/08/1951 | 16 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1952 | 21/06/1952 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1953 | 15/12/1953 | 56 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 22/12/1953 | 23/12/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1954 | 11/01/1954 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1954 | 13/11/1954 | 72 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1956 | 27/02/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24068 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/08/1956 | 26/11/1956 | 92 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1959 | 04/09/1959 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24047 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1959 | 17/09/1959 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1960 | 21/06/1960 | 44 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. | SLS/194905 |
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
28/11/1953 | Darlington Works | North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. | SLS/195402 |
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 927 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
13/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1925. Dep: 28/11/1925. | ||
12/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1927. Dep: 11/02/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1117 (Diagram 49) |
||
09/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1929. Dep: 08/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1172 (Diagram 49) |
||
03/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1933. Dep: 12/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49) |
||
18/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1935. Dep: 10/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1038 (Diagram 49) |
||
13/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1937. Dep: 08/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1125 (Diagram 49) |
||
12/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/05/1939. Dep: 03/08/1939. | ||
27/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1940. Dep: 20/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1614 (Diagram 49) |
||
06/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/02/1941. Dep: 04/03/1941. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
09/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/09/1942. Dep: 24/09/1942. | ||
17/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943. | ||
15/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1944. Dep: 15/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49) |
||
05/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/11/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. | ||
29/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1946. Dep: 09/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1610 (Diagram 49) |
||
22/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1422 | ||
06/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1947. Dep: 23/10/1947. | ||
08/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1949. Dep: 31/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR 61422 |
||
06/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
09/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/08/1951. Dep: 24/08/1951. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
22/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/05/1952. Dep: 21/06/1952. | ||
07/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
21/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 21/10/1953. Dep: 15/12/1953. | ||
22/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/12/1953. Dep: 23/12/1953. | ||
07/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/01/1954. Dep: 11/01/1954. | ||
03/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/09/1954. Dep: 13/11/1954. | ||
29/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
26/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1956. Dep: 27/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24068 (Diagram 49) |
||
27/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/08/1956. Dep: 26/11/1956. | ||
04/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1959. Dep: 04/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24047 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/09/1959. Dep: 17/09/1959. | ||
09/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1960. Dep: 21/06/1960. | ||
25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61422 from York (North) (50A) | ||
12/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |