|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 10/01/1924 | 06/03/1924 | 57 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 02/05/1927 | 20/10/1927 | 172 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 24/04/1929 | 04/07/1929 | 72 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1932 | 11/04/1932 | 32 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1933 | 11/12/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2556 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/07/1936 | 05/08/1936 | 20 days | General | Boiler number D1465 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1937 | 02/05/1938 | 145 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1939 | 04/07/1939 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3029 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1941 | 28/11/1941 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1944 | 11/05/1944 | 35 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 07/12/1944 | 13/01/1945 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24039 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1948 | 09/10/1948 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61414 |
||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1949 | 10/09/1949 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 16/03/1951 | 20/03/1951 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1952 | 08/03/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24048 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1954 | 30/06/1954 | 38 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1954 | 04/09/1954 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1955 | 28/05/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1955 | 01/06/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1958 | 16/10/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24046 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1958 | 27/10/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/10/1955 | North Eastern Miscellany | Class B16 engines have now appeared at sheds in the Newcastle-upon-Tyne area and the following have been noted working between Heaton and Berwick on various classes of trains: 61410/13/14/15/40/67/69. Class K2 2-6-0 locos noted en route between Newcastle and Cowlairs recently for overhaul and repainting have been Nos. 61720/27/62/65. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73101 worked a Newcastle-Berwick passenger train on the 21st Sept. en route for the Scottish Region. Class J21 0-6-0 Nos. 65117 an 65070 were hauled dead by a Class J39 for the north on 4/10 and a class Dll 4-4-0 62684 hauled Class K1 62031 dead from Haymarket shed to Gateshead on October 5th. During mid-October, Class D49 4-4-0 Nos. 62752 an 62720 have been observed working a morning Sunderland-Newcastle slow passenger train as a running-in turn, both engines being recently ex-works. | SLS/195512 |
17/12/1960 | Mirfield MPD | From 17th Dec., six B16s have been allocated for freight duties, viz.' 61411-4/6/47;, during 1959, several were on loan to this shed while the 4 Mirfield B1s were in shops. | SLS/196102 |
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 914 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
10/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1924. Dep: 06/03/1924. | ||
02/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1927. Dep: 20/10/1927. | ||
24/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1929. Dep: 04/07/1929. | ||
31/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
11/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/03/1932. Dep: 11/04/1932. | ||
06/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1933. Dep: 11/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2556 (Diagram 49) |
||
17/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1936. Dep: 05/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1465 (Diagram 49) |
||
09/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/12/1937. Dep: 02/05/1938. | ||
23/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1939. Dep: 04/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3029 (Diagram 49A) |
||
16/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1941. Dep: 28/11/1941. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
07/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/04/1944. Dep: 11/05/1944. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
07/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1944. Dep: 13/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24039 (Diagram 49A) |
||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1414 | ||
17/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1948. Dep: 09/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61414 |
||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
17/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/08/1949. Dep: 10/09/1949. | ||
16/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/03/1951. Dep: 20/03/1951. | ||
12/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1952. Dep: 08/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24048 (Diagram 49) |
||
24/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/05/1954. Dep: 30/06/1954. | ||
31/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/08/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954. | ||
03/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1955. Dep: 28/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A) |
||
31/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/05/1955. Dep: 01/06/1955. | ||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
13/05/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
11/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1958. Dep: 16/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24046 (Diagram 49A) |
||
21/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1958. Dep: 27/10/1958. | ||
11/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61414 from Mirfield (56D) | ||
11/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |