|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1922 | 07/1922 | General | ||||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1924 | 10/02/1925 | 81 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1928 | 18/07/1928 | 65 days | General | Boiler number D1942 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1932 | 27/07/1932 | 44 days | General | Boiler number D636 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1934 | 03/10/1934 | 41 days | Heavy | Boiler number 50 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1937 | 07/04/1937 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2875 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1937 | 08/04/1937 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1937 | 20/04/1937 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1938 | 17/10/1938 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1939 | 20/10/1939 | 51 days | General | Boiler number D1939 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1942 | 09/12/1942 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2658 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1945 | 07/04/1945 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1947 | 05/12/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Darlington Works | New 'B.1' Class 4-6-0 No. 1036 (Dar. 2016/47) has appeared with the name Ralph Assheton, No. 1037 Jairou (Dar. 2017/47), No. 1038 Blacktail (Dar. 2018/47) and No. 1039 Steinbok (Dar. 2019/47); the plate dates of the last two are December. The first of the 'L1' Class 2-6-4T's to be built here, 9001 was completed in December and on 29/12 was in the Paint Shop. A number of 'Atlantics' have arrived on Works and include 'C6' Nos. 2931/34/41/47; 'Cl' 2991/96; with the exception of No. 2941, all have recently been withdrawn. 'D2' No. 2178 and 'C1' No. 2835 have now gone in for scrapping, while the last 'B15' No. 1696 is on the Works road at the shed. No. 508 is awaiting shops. | SLS/194801 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1912 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 820 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/07/1922. | ||
22/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1924. Dep: 10/02/1925. | ||
11/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
01/04/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
15/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1928. Dep: 18/07/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1942 (Diagram 50) |
||
14/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1932. Dep: 27/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D636 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/08/1934. Dep: 03/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 50 (Diagram 50) |
||
01/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1937. Dep: 07/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2875 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/04/1937. Dep: 08/04/1937. | ||
09/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1937. Dep: 20/04/1937. | ||
20/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1938. Dep: 17/10/1938. | ||
10/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
31/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1939. Dep: 20/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1939 (Diagram 50) |
||
06/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
07/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1942. Dep: 09/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2658 (Diagram 50) |
||
23/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1945. Dep: 07/04/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1322 but not taken up | ||
05/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1696 | ||
05/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 05/12/1947. Dep: 05/12/1947. | ||
27/12/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1696 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |