|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 14/05/1924 | 14/07/1924 | 62 days | General | Boiler number D101 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1924 | 06/09/1924 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1927 | 29/09/1927 | 107 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1930 | 26/08/1930 | 110 days | General | Boiler number HL991 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1933 | 19/05/1933 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1935 | 25/01/1936 | 47 days | General | Boiler number D1963 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1938 | 06/09/1938 | 106 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1938 | 03/11/1938 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1939 | 08/05/1939 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1941 | 19/11/1941 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 988 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1942 | 23/06/1942 | 65 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1944 | 15/09/1944 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2875 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1947 | 02/05/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1912 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 815 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
01/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
14/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1924. Dep: 14/07/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number D101 (Diagram 50) |
||
26/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1924. Dep: 06/09/1924. | ||
06/09/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
22/09/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
15/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1927. Dep: 29/09/1927. | ||
09/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1930. Dep: 26/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL991 (Diagram 50) |
||
04/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1933. Dep: 19/05/1933. | ||
10/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1935. Dep: 25/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1963 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1938. Dep: 06/09/1938. | ||
19/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/10/1938. Dep: 03/11/1938. | ||
27/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1939. Dep: 08/05/1939. | ||
08/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1941. Dep: 19/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 988 (Diagram 50) |
||
20/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/04/1942. Dep: 23/06/1942. | ||
09/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1944. Dep: 15/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2875 (Diagram 50) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1319 but not taken up | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1693 | ||
02/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 02/05/1947. Dep: 02/05/1947. | ||
31/05/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1693 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |