|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 25/11/1922 | 28/02/1923 | 96 days | General | Boiler number D699 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1925 | 21/08/1925 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1926 | 21/12/1926 | 162 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1928 | 14/05/1928 | 43 days | Heavy | Boiler number D132 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1929 | 04/09/1929 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 2260 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1930 | 24/02/1930 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1933 | 01/06/1933 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2439 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1933 | 11/09/1933 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1935 | 20/06/1935 | 39 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1936 | 11/12/1936 | 73 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1939 | 08/01/1940 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1941 | 02/01/1942 | 33 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1942 | 14/11/1942 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1944 | 25/02/1944 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1912 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 813 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Scarborough (SCA) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
25/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1922. Dep: 28/02/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number D699 (Diagram 50) |
||
01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
30/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/07/1925. Dep: 21/08/1925. | ||
13/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1926. Dep: 21/12/1926. | ||
02/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/04/1928. Dep: 14/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D132 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1929. Dep: 04/09/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2260 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1930. Dep: 24/02/1930. | ||
24/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1933. Dep: 01/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2439 (Diagram 50) |
||
30/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/08/1933. Dep: 11/09/1933. | ||
13/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/05/1935. Dep: 20/06/1935. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
30/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1936. Dep: 11/12/1936. | ||
14/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
18/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1939. Dep: 08/01/1940. | ||
01/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/12/1941. Dep: 02/01/1942. | ||
14/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/10/1942. Dep: 14/11/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
25/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/02/1944. Dep: 25/02/1944. | ||
18/03/1944 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 813 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1318 but not taken up |