|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 20/09/1923 | 22/12/1923 | 94 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/11/1925 | 31/03/1926 | 134 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/08/1927 | 25/11/1927 | 92 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 31/05/1929 | 24/07/1929 | 55 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/01/1930 | 07/03/1930 | 40 days | General | Boiler number HL984 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1933 | 22/12/1933 | 44 days | General | Boiler number D1165 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1934 | 18/08/1934 | 59 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1935 | 18/06/1935 | 51 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1936 | 17/04/1936 | 61 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1937 | 24/11/1937 | 79 days | General | Boiler number D1170 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1940 | 01/08/1940 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2386 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1943 | 27/02/1943 | 31 days | General | Boiler number HL108 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1912 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 798 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
20/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923. | ||
18/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1925. Dep: 31/03/1926. | ||
26/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1927. Dep: 25/11/1927. | ||
31/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/05/1929. Dep: 24/07/1929. | ||
27/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1930. Dep: 07/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL984 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1933. Dep: 22/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1165 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/06/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934. | ||
29/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/04/1935. Dep: 18/06/1935. | ||
17/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1936. Dep: 17/04/1936. | ||
07/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1937. Dep: 24/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1170 (Diagram 50) |
||
30/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
03/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1940. Dep: 01/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2386 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1943. Dep: 27/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL108 (Diagram 50) |
||
15/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 15/09/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. | ||
16/10/1945 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 798 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1317 but not taken up |