|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1920 | 10/1920 | General | ||||
Gateshead Works | 05/02/1923 | 30/04/1923 | 85 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1924 | 04/06/1924 | 33 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/01/1925 | 31/03/1925 | 82 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1925 | 13/05/1925 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1926 | 17/01/1927 | 193 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1928 | 11/12/1928 | 57 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 2152 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1931 | 28/05/1931 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1933 | 24/07/1933 | 41 days | General | Boiler number D1170 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1937 | 17/09/1937 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 786 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 50Sat boiler fitted |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/10/1920. | ||
07/10/1920 | Modification | Diagram 50Sat number D80 boiler fitted | ||
05/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1923. Dep: 30/04/1923. | ||
03/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1924. Dep: 04/06/1924. | ||
09/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1925. Dep: 31/03/1925. | ||
24/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/04/1925. Dep: 13/05/1925. | ||
09/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1926. Dep: 17/01/1927. | ||
16/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1928. Dep: 11/12/1928. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 2152 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1931. Dep: 28/05/1931. | ||
14/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1933. Dep: 24/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1170 (Diagram 50) |
||
17/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/09/1937. Dep: 17/09/1937. | ||
18/09/1937 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 786 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |