|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 28/04/1911 | 27/05/1911 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 1221 (Diagram GC9) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1921 | 25/03/1922 | 120 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1924 | 16/08/1924 | 162 days | General | Boiler number 1827 (Diagram GC9) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1926 | 03/04/1926 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/08/1927 | 12/11/1927 | 92 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1929 | 27/04/1929 | 78 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 1772 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1931 | 21/02/1931 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1933 | 08/04/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1935 | 17/08/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/06/1937 | 17/07/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/01/1940 | 27/01/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3722 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1942 | 26/12/1942 | 25 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1945 | 28/07/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1946 | 25/05/1946 | 29 days | Light Repair | New cylinders fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1114 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4815 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted |
||
28/04/1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1911. Dep: 27/05/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1221 (Diagram GC9) |
||
10/02/1920 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
26/11/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1921. Dep: 25/03/1922. | ||
08/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 16/08/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1827 (Diagram GC9) |
||
30/08/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 6114 | ||
06/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1926. Dep: 03/04/1926. | ||
13/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1927. Dep: 12/11/1927. | ||
09/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1929. Dep: 27/04/1929. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 1772 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
24/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1931. Dep: 21/02/1931. | ||
25/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1933. Dep: 08/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
18/07/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
17/06/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
27/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
19/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1937. Dep: 17/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
06/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1940. Dep: 27/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3722 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
13/04/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
06/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1942. Dep: 26/12/1942. | ||
30/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
26/08/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1351 but not taken up | ||
27/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/04/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted |
||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1478 | ||
10/12/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1478 from Brunswick (LIV) |