|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/05/1924 | 26/07/1924 | 81 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5034 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1927 | 15/01/1927 | -280 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1927 | 11/02/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1928 | 29/12/1928 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1930 | 06/12/1930 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1928 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1932 | 05/11/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 355 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1934 | 15/09/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 66 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1936 | 05/09/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1938 | 10/12/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1940 | 19/10/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1942 | 14/11/1942 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1944 | 14/10/1944 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3021 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1922 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 34 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6110 Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
25/08/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
19/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
05/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1924. Dep: 26/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5034 |
||
08/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
30/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
27/03/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
23/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1927. Dep: 15/01/1927. | ||
31/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1927. Dep: 11/02/1928. | ||
03/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1928. Dep: 29/12/1928. | ||
25/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1930. Dep: 06/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1928 (Diagram 13) |
||
08/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1932. Dep: 05/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 355 (Diagram 13) |
||
18/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1934. Dep: 15/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 66 (Diagram 13) |
||
15/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1936. Dep: 05/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13) |
||
16/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
13/12/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
12/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1938. Dep: 10/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13) |
||
17/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
21/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1942. Dep: 14/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 13) |
||
03/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
24/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
21/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
05/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
24/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13) |
||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
30/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1386 | ||
08/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3021 (Diagram 13) |
||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61386 but not taken up | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61708 but not taken up | ||
13/06/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1386 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF) |