|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/06/1925 | 26/09/1925 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5033 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1927 | 29/10/1927 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1929 | 08/06/1929 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 295 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1931 | 21/03/1931 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/04/1933 | 06/05/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 66 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1934 | 25/08/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 781 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1934 | 20/10/1934 | 15 days | Light Repair | Lubricator changed |
||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1936 | 27/06/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1937 | 25/09/1937 | 50 days | General | Four new cylinders fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1939 | 18/11/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1942 | 11/04/1942 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1943 | 06/03/1943 | 51 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1944 | 08/04/1944 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/08/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3048 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1922 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 33 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6109 Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
05/08/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
19/07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
08/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
27/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1925. Dep: 26/09/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5033 |
||
27/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927. | ||
16/02/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
04/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 295 (Diagram 13) |
||
06/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/06/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
21/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1931. Dep: 21/03/1931. | ||
15/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 66 (Diagram 13) |
||
04/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1934. Dep: 25/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 781 (Diagram 13) |
||
06/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/10/1934. Dep: 20/10/1934. Work undertaken: Lubricator changed |
||
30/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1936. Dep: 27/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 13) |
||
07/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1937. Dep: 25/09/1937. Work undertaken: Four new cylinders fitted |
||
28/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13) |
||
17/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1942. Dep: 11/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13) |
||
15/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/01/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
11/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
03/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
10/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1944. Dep: 08/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 13) |
||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
03/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3048 (Diagram 13) |
||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1385 | ||
16/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61385 but not taken up | ||
12/01/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1385 from Gorton (GOR) |