|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 21/07/1909 | 27/08/1909 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 829 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1912 | 21/12/1912 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 341 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/01/1915 | 01/05/1915 | 120 days | General | Boiler number 343 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1919 | 20/03/1920 | 288 days | General | Ash ejector fitted Boiler number 1844 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/04/1922 | 27/05/1922 | 50 days | General | Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1924 | 12/07/1924 | 120 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5182 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/02/1926 | 30/06/1926 | 131 days | General | Boiler number 1777 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/08/1927 | 08/10/1927 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1929 | 16/03/1929 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1930 | 31/12/1930 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 1796 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1933 | 15/04/1933 | 36 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1933 | 18/11/1933 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1935 | 13/04/1935 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/01/1937 | 06/02/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1939 | 20/05/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/11/1941 | 13/12/1941 | 30 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1943 | 24/07/1943 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3721 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1946 | 29/06/1946 | 43 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1947 | 25/10/1947 | 1 day | Light Repair | Right hand cylinder fractured |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 182 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4533 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
21/07/1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1909. Dep: 27/08/1909. Work undertaken: Boiler number 829 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
26/10/1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1912. Dep: 21/12/1912. Work undertaken: Boiler number 341 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
02/01/1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1915. Dep: 01/05/1915. Work undertaken: Boiler number 343 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
07/06/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1919. Dep: 20/03/1920. Work undertaken: Ash ejector fitted Boiler number 1844 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
08/04/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1922. Dep: 27/05/1922. Work undertaken: Ross Pop |
||
15/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 12/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5182 |
||
20/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1926. Dep: 30/06/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1777 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
13/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927. | ||
14/01/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
26/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1929. Dep: 16/03/1929. | ||
22/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1930. Dep: 31/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1796 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
11/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 15/04/1933. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
28/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/10/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933. | ||
23/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1935. Dep: 13/04/1935. | ||
03/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
16/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1937. Dep: 06/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
06/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
14/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1941. Dep: 13/12/1941. | ||
11/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
31/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
26/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 24/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3721 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1307 but not taken up | ||
18/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 29/06/1946. | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1685 | ||
22/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
14/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
25/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1947. Dep: 25/10/1947. Work undertaken: Right hand cylinder fractured |
||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61685 but not taken up | ||
06/03/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1685 from Mexborough (MEX) |