|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 14/10/1910 | 26/11/1910 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 1208 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1913 | 14/06/1913 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 834 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1914 | 31/10/1914 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1211 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1921 | 30/04/1921 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1922 | 14/10/1922 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1924 | 26/04/1924 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 16Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6099 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1926 | 11/12/1926 | 183 days | General | Superheated boiler & new slide valve cylinders fitted Boiler number 784 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1929 | 15/06/1929 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1930 | 19/04/1930 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1931 | 02/05/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1933 | 08/04/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1935 | 11/05/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1936 | 31/12/1936 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1940 | 27/04/1940 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class B4/4 Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1941 | 08/02/1941 | 15 days | Light Repair | New right hand cylinder |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1943 | 12/06/1943 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1944 | 09/12/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1946 | 31/08/1946 | 1 day | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 1484 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1099 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4820 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted |
||
14/10/1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1910. Dep: 26/11/1910. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1208 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
03/05/1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1913. Dep: 14/06/1913. Work undertaken: Boiler number 834 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
12/09/1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1914. Dep: 31/10/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1211 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
12/02/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1921. Dep: 30/04/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
30/09/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/08/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1922. Dep: 14/10/1922. | ||
01/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1924. Dep: 26/04/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 16Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6099 |
||
01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
30/05/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
02/01/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
12/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1926. Dep: 11/12/1926. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler & new slide valve cylinders fitted Boiler number 784 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
27/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1929. Dep: 15/06/1929. | ||
12/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1930. Dep: 19/04/1930. | ||
28/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1931. Dep: 02/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
25/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1933. Dep: 08/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
27/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1935. Dep: 11/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
12/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1936. Dep: 31/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
25/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B4/4 Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
27/04/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
25/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/01/1941. Dep: 08/02/1941. Work undertaken: New right hand cylinder |
||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
01/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1943. Dep: 12/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
11/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
02/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1494 but not taken up | ||
19/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
31/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 1484 |
||
20/11/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1484 from Ardsley (ARD) |