|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/06/1951 | 23/06/1951 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1951 | 04/07/1951 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1952 | 05/09/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28833 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1954 | 27/09/1954 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28285 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1956 | 20/10/1956 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28402 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1958 | 25/01/1958 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 24/02/1959 | 10/04/1959 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28804 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1959 | 03/06/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1960 | 13/10/1960 | 17 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/12/1950 | A readers day out | On 30/12/1950 I (A. P. Greenough) travelled by excursion train from Shirebrook (North) to Nottingham via the old G.N. line to Annesley tunnel, then down the G.C. 'direct' line. Regular passenger services on the line were suspended many years ago: nevertheless the track was well kept, the stations (solidly built in local stone) in excellent condition and the name-boards still in place. The train consisted of nine miscellaneous coaches, ranging from a G.N. 12-wheeled clerestory (bow-ended) saloon to a L.N.E. bucketseat 'twin.' Langwith Jc. shed borrowed Lincoln's best 'B.1' for the job (61405), as their only passenger locos. are the 'A.5' tanks for the Chesterfield-Lincoln trains. I was the only passenger from Shirebrook, 4 got in at Pleasley, about 30 at Skegby, and between 150 and 200 at Sutton: the weather was bad (snow lying), but on previous recent occasions the train has been very well patronised. The fare from Shirebrook (over 20 miles) was half-a-crown return. On the same day excursions were run from Shirebrook (L.M.) to Lincoln (St. Marks) via Mansfield and Southwell (for football) and also to Derby via Kirkby-in-Ashfield, Pye Bridge and Ambergate. | SLS/195103 |
02/04/1959 | Stratford Works (Old Works) | Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. | SLS/195905 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/05/1950 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61405 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2107 Allocated to Lincoln (40A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
07/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/06/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951. | ||
26/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/06/1951. Dep: 04/07/1951. | ||
10/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1952. Dep: 05/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28833 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1954. Dep: 27/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28285 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1956. Dep: 20/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28402 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1958. Dep: 25/01/1958. | ||
24/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1959. Dep: 10/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28804 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/05/1959. Dep: 03/06/1959. | ||
27/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/09/1960. Dep: 13/10/1960. | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61405 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge |