Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 370 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3961 Week
» 14096 Month
» 330327 Year
» 841429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1946) 1057   08/07/1946
BR 61057   10/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L958
Works Number 25813
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service Mon 08/07/1946 to Ipswich (IPS)
Withdrawal Mon 17/04/1950 off Ipswich (32B)
Scrapping During 04/1950 at Locomotive Works (Stratford)
Service Life 3 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Engine and tender cut up at Stratford after damage in collision at Marks Tey, 7/3/50. Boiler re-used.

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IPS Ipswich (New) 08/07/1946
   Withdrawn 17/04/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN 32B Ipswich 17/04/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/07/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 3625)
26/12/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 3404)
13/04/1948 Front end heater connection fitted
13/04/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5124)
19/08/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9751)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Stratford Works 25/10/1946 26/12/1946 63 days Heavy
Boiler number 3404 (Diagram 100A)
 
Stratford Works 05/03/1948 13/04/1948 40 days General
Boiler number 5124 (Diagram 100A)
Front end heater connection fitted
Renumbered to BR 61057
 
Stratford Works 21/05/1948 10/06/1948 21 days Unclassified
Painting only
 
Doncaster Works 01/07/1949 19/08/1949 50 days General
Boiler number 9751 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/07/1946 To Service To service as LNER Number 1057
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25813
Allocated to Ipswich (IPS)
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
25/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/10/1946. Dep: 26/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3404 (Diagram 100A)
   
05/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1948. Dep: 13/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5124 (Diagram 100A)
Front end heater connection fitted
Renumbered to BR 61057
   
21/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/05/1948. Dep: 10/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Painting only
   
01/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1949. Dep: 19/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9751 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/1950 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford    
17/04/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 61057 from Ipswich (32B)    

prev prev