|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 26/11/1945 | 12/01/1946 | 48 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 19/08/1947 | 25/10/1947 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 28574 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 16/04/1948 | 18/04/1948 | 3 days | Unclassified | Renumbered to BR 61009 |
||
Stratford Works | 03/10/1949 | 05/11/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3753 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/08/1951 | 06/10/1951 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28523 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1952 | 04/09/1952 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1953 | 02/11/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28172 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/04/1955 | 16/05/1955 | 29 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1956 | 15/01/1957 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1958 | 18/09/1958 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 02/03/1959 | 17/04/1959 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28295 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1959 | 24/09/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1960 | 19/08/1960 | 11 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/04/1959 | Stratford Works (Old Works) | Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. | SLS/195905 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/06/1944 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 8310, name: HARTEBEESTE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1934 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) |
||
06/07/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
03/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
03/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
26/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946. | ||
02/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1009 | ||
19/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1947. Dep: 25/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28574 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/04/1948. Dep: 18/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61009 |
||
03/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1949. Dep: 05/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3753 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28523 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
19/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/08/1952. Dep: 04/09/1952. | ||
05/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1953. Dep: 02/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28172 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
05/12/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
18/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1955. Dep: 16/05/1955. | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
06/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1956. Dep: 15/01/1957. | ||
29/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
10/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
28/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/08/1958. Dep: 18/09/1958. | ||
02/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1959. Dep: 17/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28295 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/09/1959. Dep: 24/09/1959. | ||
09/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1960. Dep: 19/08/1960. | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61009 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
05/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge |