|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 02/10/1944 | 18/10/1944 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 25/02/1946 | 18/04/1946 | 53 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 03/12/1946 | 21/12/1946 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 06/04/1948 | 11/05/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28565 (Diagram 100A) Front end heater connection fitted Renumbered to BR 61008 |
||
Stratford Works | 07/04/1949 | 08/04/1949 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 17/04/1950 | 10/06/1950 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 28578 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 26/06/1950 | 01/07/1950 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 31/07/1950 | 04/08/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 21/01/1952 | 02/02/1952 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 21/07/1952 | 30/08/1952 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28518 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 29/09/1953 | 10/10/1953 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 12/08/1954 | 02/10/1954 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 28869 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/06/1955 | 24/06/1955 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1957 | 14/03/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28431 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1957 | 09/05/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1958 | 23/10/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28461 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1960 | 23/09/1960 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28131 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1961 | 20/11/1961 | 32 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
14/04/1963 | Eastfield MPD | 61008 transferred from LMR, ex Works-65916/32, and waiting Works-44194, 45713/24, 57653, 61147/80/346, 64527, 64790/814/44/69/97/910/24/9, 90060 an 90759. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/05/1944 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 8309, name: KUDU Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1931 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
03/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
18/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
02/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/10/1944. Dep: 18/10/1944. | ||
03/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
03/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
29/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
27/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1008 | ||
25/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1946. Dep: 18/04/1946. | ||
17/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
03/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946. | ||
25/01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
06/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1948. Dep: 11/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28565 (Diagram 100A) Front end heater connection fitted Renumbered to BR 61008 |
||
16/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
22/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
07/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/04/1949. Dep: 08/04/1949. | ||
17/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1950. Dep: 10/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28578 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/06/1950. Dep: 01/07/1950. | ||
31/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/07/1950. Dep: 04/08/1950. | ||
21/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/01/1952. Dep: 02/02/1952. | ||
21/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1952. Dep: 30/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28518 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1953. Dep: 10/10/1953. | ||
12/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1954. Dep: 02/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28869 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1955. Dep: 24/06/1955. | ||
23/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
12/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1957. Dep: 14/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28431 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1957. Dep: 09/05/1957. | ||
17/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1958. Dep: 23/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28461 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) | ||
16/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1960. Dep: 23/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28131 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1961. Dep: 20/11/1961. | ||
21/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
16/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
13/06/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carstairs (66E) | ||
09/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61008 from Carstairs (66E) | ||
02/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |