|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 24/01/1944 | 12/02/1944 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1945 | 07/06/1945 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 9431 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 15/11/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 23/09/1946 | 09/11/1946 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 9426 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 09/05/1947 | 14/05/1947 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 29/11/1948 | 22/01/1949 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 9693 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/01/1950 | 18/01/1950 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 18/12/1950 | 03/02/1951 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 28529 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 13/03/1951 | 14/03/1951 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 01/01/1952 | 12/01/1952 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 24/06/1952 | 26/06/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1953 | 05/03/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28857 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 23/08/1954 | 08/10/1954 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28427 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/01/1956 | 30/01/1956 | 25 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1956 | 29/12/1956 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28276 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/09/1958 | 17/10/1958 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1960 | 23/07/1960 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28192 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/06/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 8302, name: ELAND Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1912 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
30/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
10/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
24/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944. | ||
25/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
11/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
28/02/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
22/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1945. Dep: 07/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9431 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/11/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. | ||
27/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1001 | ||
24/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
23/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9426 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
09/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/05/1947. Dep: 14/05/1947. | ||
01/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
07/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
10/04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61001 | ||
29/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1948. Dep: 22/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9693 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/01/1950. Dep: 18/01/1950. | ||
26/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
01/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
30/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
18/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1950. Dep: 03/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28529 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/03/1951. Dep: 14/03/1951. | ||
01/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/01/1952. Dep: 12/01/1952. | ||
22/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
24/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1952. Dep: 26/06/1952. | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
03/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1953. Dep: 05/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28857 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1954. Dep: 08/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28427 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/01/1956. Dep: 30/01/1956. | ||
20/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1956. Dep: 29/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28276 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
03/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
08/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1958. Dep: 17/10/1958. | ||
27/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
29/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
15/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1960. Dep: 23/07/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28192 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61001 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |