|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1948 | 21/05/1948 | 45 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60521 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1949 | 15/12/1949 | 37 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1951 | 19/07/1951 | 39 days | General | Lipped chimney |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1952 | 31/10/1952 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29782 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1954 | 02/04/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29777 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1955 | 20/05/1955 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1955 | 30/11/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29789 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1957 | 26/10/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29783 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/09/1958 | 19/09/1958 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1959 | 24/02/1959 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1959 | 03/07/1959 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 10592 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1960 | 26/08/1960 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1961 | 16/03/1961 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29783 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1961 | 02/08/1961 | 17 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/05/1947 | Doncaster Works | Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). | SLS/194708 |
30/06/1947 | General | The 'Pacifics' of Thompson's design, Nos. 500 and 511-520, which were formerly designated 'A.2' Class, were towards the end of April re-classified 'A.2/3': this series will end with No. 524. The Doncaster No. of 520 Owen Tudor is 2010, and of 521 (completed early in May) 2011. As No. 500 carries works No. 2000, and 3167 is presumably Doncaster No. 2001, Nos. 511-520 were expected to appear as Nos. 2002-2011; No. 515 Sun Stream is 2006/1946. | SLS/194708 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/05/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 521, name: WATLING STREET Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2012 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 117 boiler fitted |
||
07/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1948. Dep: 21/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60521 |
||
09/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 15/12/1949. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
15/12/1949 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
11/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1951. Dep: 19/07/1951. Work undertaken: Lipped chimney |
||
29/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1952. Dep: 31/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29782 (Diagram 117) |
||
01/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1954. Dep: 02/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29777 (Diagram 117) |
||
04/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/05/1955. Dep: 20/05/1955. | ||
25/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1955. Dep: 30/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29789 (Diagram 117) |
||
25/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1957. Dep: 26/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29783 (Diagram 117) |
||
03/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/09/1958. Dep: 19/09/1958. | ||
07/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/02/1959. Dep: 24/02/1959. | ||
26/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1959. Dep: 03/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10592 (Diagram 118) |
||
22/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
30/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1960. Dep: 26/08/1960. | ||
10/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1961. Dep: 16/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29783 (Diagram 117) |
||
17/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/07/1961. Dep: 02/08/1961. | ||
01/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60521 from Tweedmouth (52D) |