|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1947 | 15/02/1947 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/06/1947 | 20/06/1947 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1948 | 22/10/1948 | 38 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60519 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1950 | 18/05/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1950 | 21/07/1950 | 45 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1952 | 07/05/1952 | 35 days | H/1 | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1953 | 31/12/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29785 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1955 | 27/04/1955 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29784 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1956 | 08/12/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29782 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1958 | 25/04/1958 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29868 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1959 | 02/12/1959 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29826 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1961 | 04/08/1961 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29818 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/12/1962 | 18/12/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1947 | General | The 'Pacifics' of Thompson's design, Nos. 500 and 511-520, which were formerly designated 'A.2' Class, were towards the end of April re-classified 'A.2/3': this series will end with No. 524. The Doncaster No. of 520 Owen Tudor is 2010, and of 521 (completed early in May) 2011. As No. 500 carries works No. 2000, and 3167 is presumably Doncaster No. 2001, Nos. 511-520 were expected to appear as Nos. 2002-2011; No. 515 Sun Stream is 2006/1946. | SLS/194708 |
01/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives under repair here on 1/10 included Nos. 8, 37, 87, 98, 516/19, 1092, 1107/09/12/24, 60007/18/19/20/60, 60635 an 61120. | SLS/194811 |
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
31/01/1954 | York MPD | J77 class 0-6-OT's, normally rare at York, were represented there in January by 68435 (53C) under repair at the north shed towards the end of the month, and 68401 (53B) shunting at Queen Street and later under repair at the south shed. On 1/1/54 65022 (Class J2) was noted 'dead' en route for breaking up at Darlington Works hauled by an 'Austerity' 2-8-0. By contrast new Diesel 13079 from Darlington came up light through York on 19/1/54. Other unusual visitors included 60519 (64B) ex-works on Doncaster turns into York on 16/1/54. One of the Westinghouse fitted Standard Class 5 4-6-0's from Derby, 73031, visited York on 6/1/54. The engine concerned in the derailment of the down 'Heart of Midlothian' at Thirsk on 20/1/54 was 60126 (52B) which was later noted 'dead' in York shed yard. On the evening of the derailment the down 'Aberdonian' and other expresses were diverted from York via Knaresborough, Bilton, and Ripon. 60080 (52B) failed at York on the 7.45 a.m. Newcastle-King's Cross express (non-stop from Darlington to Peterborough) on 25/1/54 and was replaced by the York south end pilot 60502 (50A) which went forward 34 minutes late. 60539 (52B) took over this working on the next day. |
SLS/195403 |
02/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196108 |
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/02/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 519, name: HONEYWAY Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2010 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Diagram 117 boiler fitted |
||
06/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/02/1947. Dep: 15/02/1947. | ||
17/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/06/1947. Dep: 20/06/1947. | ||
15/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1948. Dep: 22/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60519 |
||
14/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1950. Dep: 18/05/1950. | ||
07/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1950. Dep: 21/07/1950. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
03/04/1952 | Works Visit | |||
30/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1953. Dep: 31/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29785 (Diagram 117) |
||
21/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1955. Dep: 27/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29784 (Diagram 117) |
||
02/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1956. Dep: 08/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29782 (Diagram 117) |
||
17/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1958. Dep: 25/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29868 (Diagram 118) |
||
31/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1959. Dep: 02/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29826 (Diagram 118) |
||
29/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1961. Dep: 04/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29818 (Diagram 118) |
||
16/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
18/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60519 from York (North) (50A) | ||
18/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 18/12/1962. Dep: 18/12/1962. |