|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 18/10/1947 | 28/10/1947 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1948 | 20/03/1948 | 43 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60512 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1948 | 12/11/1948 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1949 | 06/04/1950 | 115 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1951 | 22/01/1951 | 21 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1952 | 14/05/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29777 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1952 | 22/05/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1953 | 27/02/1953 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/12/1953 | 23/01/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29786 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1955 | 04/11/1955 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29780 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1957 | 16/11/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29829 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/06/1958 | 10/07/1958 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1959 | 01/09/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1959 | 09/01/1960 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29832 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1962 | 03/08/1962 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 29829 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1962 | 21/08/1962 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/09/1962 | 08/10/1962 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1963 | 18/03/1963 | 18 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | General | N.E. Area: During the five weeks from 29th October, Dynamometer Car tests were carried out on the 9.45 a.m. Newcastle-Liverpool (Lime St.) E.P. between Newcastle and Leeds, the return to Newcastle being on the 1.50 p.m. ex. Leeds (the normal working). The locos. concerned were 'A.2' 500 Edward Thompson and 'V.2' 959. The latter loco. had presumably recently been through Darlington Works, as she worked the 1.57 p.m. Darlington-Leeds (running-in) turn on 4/10. The exact sequence as far as the 9.45 'Liverpool' was concerned was as follows:-No. 500, with 9 bogies, including the Dynamometer Car and Buffet Car and repainted Pullman Coach 477, worked the trip on 29/10, 30/10, 5/11, 6/11, and 7/11; the same engine hauled the train on the four days 12-15/11, when the load was augmented to 14 bogie coaches. No. 959 commenced running on 19/11 with the 14-coach train, and ran the four days to 22/11; on 26/11 and 27/11 959's load was reduced to the 9-coach level; and on 28/11 and 29/11 this was increased to ten coaches. This train has been worked frequently by new 'A.2' Nos. 511/2/5. The normal load is now 9 bogies, with increases up to 13 coaches at week-ends and holiday times. Before the introduction of the new time-tables on 7/10 the normal load was 12 coaches, with regular pilot assistance from Ripon to Leeds. Now any load is taken without assistance! | SLS/194702 |
30/06/1947 | General | The 'Pacifics' of Thompson's design, Nos. 500 and 511-520, which were formerly designated 'A.2' Class, were towards the end of April re-classified 'A.2/3': this series will end with No. 524. The Doncaster No. of 520 Owen Tudor is 2010, and of 521 (completed early in May) 2011. As No. 500 carries works No. 2000, and 3167 is presumably Doncaster No. 2001, Nos. 511-520 were expected to appear as Nos. 2002-2011; No. 515 Sun Stream is 2006/1946. | SLS/194708 |
29/02/1948 | Gateshead MPD | Gateshead 'A.2's' are now making regular appearances on London workings, principally the 10.0 a.m. Newcastle-King's Cross. The engine works right through to King's Cross, but the Gateshead crew are relieved at Grantham. The engine then returns north with the 'Aberdonian.' No. 512 Steady Aim seems to be very popular for this working | SLS/194803 |
31/03/1948 | Doncaster Works | Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. | SLS/194805 |
31/03/1950 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 60020/43/54, 60133/41, 60512/39, 60820/65/67, 61083, 61634, 61822/24/61, 61947/85, 67713/24, 69444, 69505. A considerable number of 'Pacific' and 'V.2' Class locomotives are being fitted with A.T.C. gear, as part of the ex-G.N. main line has already been equipped with A.T.C. apparatus; this may be extended. | SLS/195005 |
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
18/04/1953 | Scottish Miscellany | The 7.0 p.m. Edinburgh (Waverley) to Glasgow (Queen Street) Sundays only train has this year produced a number of York 50A locos. These include 60140 (three times), 60501 an 60515 (twice), 60502 an 60512. Also seen on this train 60095 (68E), 60965 (64A), 60823 (64A). This train is worked off St. Margarets depot, the engine returning on the Monday morning. No. 67500 a 4-4-2T has occasionally appeared on the Hyndland and Milngavie trains during recent weeks. New loco. No. 76000 was noted on (23/4) on local goods to Buchanan Street. B.R. 2-6-4T are now fairly regularly used on 5.51 p.m. Carlisle to Glasgow (St. Enoch). Water is taken at Dumfries and often at Kilmarnock. With 80008 some excellent work was experienced. A late start of 11 mins. at Carlisle was reduced to a late arrival at Dumfries of 5 mins. A late start from Dumfries of 8 minutes was converted to a 2 min. early arrival at Kilmarnock. Up the Nith Valley 50 m.p.h. was regularly got with eight coaches. From Kilmarnock to a stop at Gorbals Jct. the time was 30 mins. 46 secs. including a 15 m.p.h. crawl from Strathbungo. Between Shilford and Neilson 77 m.p.h. was reached. The crew appeared to have no trouble with the train at any time, in fact one would suggest their only trouble was to hold the engine in check, so freely did it run. 40185 (2-6-2T) has been working the Kirkcudbright branch recently. On occasion of Cup Final in Glasgow on (23/4) the bulk of the trains from Aberdeen were worked by L.M. Class 5, 4-6-0, assisted by 61400 of Kittybrewster depot and 60531 Bahram. |
SLS/195306 |
02/02/1963 | Glasgow - Aberdeen Pacific workings | The last regular workings of L.N.E.R Pacifics - during December and January, Ferryhill usually used 60009 an 60011 on the 7-10 a.m. to Glasgow (back with the 5-30 p.m.) but 60002/4/57/97/522/37 also appeared, whilst the standbies were 60527 or 60955 (rarely required). 60537 appeared on 25th January-one month after its 'withdrawal'! ' St. Rollox usually used 60027* on the 8-25 a.m. to Aberdeen (back with the 5-15 p.m.) with as standby 60031 or 60090, whilst 60012 was borrowed from Haymarket for most of November and December; other locomotives to appear were 60004/512/955/72 an 73153. * 60027 was in Grangemouth shed for repair on 11th February. | SLS/196303 |
10/03/1963 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. | SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 | Worcester Works (Erecting Shop) | 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/08/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 512, name: STEADY AIM Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2003 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 117 boiler fitted |
||
08/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
18/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 28/10/1947. | ||
07/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1948. Dep: 20/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60512 |
||
20/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/10/1948. Dep: 12/11/1948. | ||
13/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1949. Dep: 06/04/1950. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
02/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/01/1951. Dep: 22/01/1951. | ||
08/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1952. Dep: 14/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29777 (Diagram 117) |
||
19/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1952. Dep: 22/05/1952. | ||
14/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
19/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/02/1953. Dep: 27/02/1953. | ||
22/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1953. Dep: 23/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29786 (Diagram 117) |
||
28/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1955. Dep: 04/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29780 (Diagram 117) |
||
15/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1957. Dep: 16/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29829 (Diagram 118) |
||
30/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1958. Dep: 10/07/1958. | ||
24/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/08/1959. Dep: 01/09/1959. | ||
05/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1959. Dep: 09/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29832 (Diagram 118) |
||
05/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1962. Dep: 03/08/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29829 (Diagram 118) |
||
16/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/08/1962. Dep: 21/08/1962. | ||
06/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/09/1962. Dep: 08/10/1962. | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
01/03/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/03/1963. Dep: 18/03/1963. | ||
15/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
14/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
19/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60512 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |