|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 04/07/1944 | 28/07/1944 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1944 | 02/09/1944 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1944 | 07/11/1944 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1945 | 28/03/1945 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1945 | 28/06/1945 | 25 days | Light Repair | Electric lighting fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1945 | 24/12/1945 | 60 days | Heavy | 8 wheel tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1946 | 21/11/1946 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1947 | 31/05/1947 | 64 days | General | Named HIGHLAND CHIEFTAIN |
||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1947 | 04/09/1947 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1947 | 28/11/1947 | 46 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1948 | 29/10/1948 | 80 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60507 |
||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1948 | 15/01/1949 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1949 | 12/10/1949 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1950 | 09/10/1950 | 46 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1951 | 04/07/1951 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29371 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1952 | 24/09/1952 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1953 | 21/08/1953 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/01/1954 | 01/02/1954 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
R & W Hawthorn | 09/02/1954 | 02/03/1954 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1954 | 26/08/1954 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1954 | 03/09/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1956 | 15/02/1956 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1956 | 02/06/1956 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1956 | 16/07/1956 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1957 | 16/10/1957 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29355 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1957 | 21/11/1957 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1957 | 01/01/1958 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1958 | 09/08/1958 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1958 | 01/10/1958 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1959 | 12/03/1959 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1959 | 16/12/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29371 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1959 | 24/12/1959 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/11/1960 | 24/11/1960 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1946 | Doncaster Works | 3696 recently left Plant after its first general repair. A number of modifications have been incorporated, including the replacement of the new pattern regulator valve and hurdle by the Gresley type (it is understood that the new pattern had shown a tendency to stick), the substitution of the usual Pacific type screw reverse for the steam reverse originally fitted, and the removal of the hinged discs over the headlamps and the substitution of normal headlamp brackets. The loco now has-the eight-wheeled tender formerly attached to 4469. 4470 has also been On Plant, and has had a number of alterations made. The smoke deflectors previously mentioned have now been fitted, and the nameplates are attached to them. They are slightly sloped at the front, and turned in at the top. The cab floor of this loco was originally 6' higher than is standard on the Pacifics, but this was found to involve additional strain on the fireman. The floor has now been lowered to the usual height, and at the same time the outside of the cab and the rear portion of the running plate have been altered to the usual Pacific pattern. The external modifications to the loco have been very beneficial to its appearance. The loco has also had headlamp brackets fitted in addition to the discs. Owing to difficulties experienced with breakages of the outside exhaust pipes on the Thompson Pacifics, these pipes have now been fitted with a sliding joint. The trouble has thereby been cured. Ten O6's, 3148-57, have been turned out without Works' numbers to allow for the numbers 1554-63, which were left blank following the cancellation of a batch of J50's to which they were allotted. ln those days the Works' numbers were allotted in-advance by the Drawing Office, but they are now allotted by 'the Foreman of the New Erecting Shop to ensure that the correct sequence is maintained if two-or more orders are being executed simultaneously. It is likely that the first of the new batch of A2's will be Doncaster No. 2000. On 29/12, O6's 3156-61 were under construction. Two more conversions to A3 have been made, using the boilers off the Pl.'s. 2548 has the boiler with ordinary dome off 2393 (converted in October), whilst 2572 received the banjo-dome poiler off 2394 in November. It is Understood that conversion of the K3's to K5 is likely to be proceeded with rapidly. |
SLS/194602 |
19/08/1947 | Darlington Works | The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. | SLS/194710 |
31/08/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August | SLS/194810 |
01/11/1948 | Darlington Works | The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's. It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable. |
SLS/194812 |
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
24/08/1954 | Doncaster Works | On 24/8/54 a visit to the new erecting shop at Doncaster Works revealed the first two (80106-7) of the batch of ten BR standard 2-6-4Ts in early stages of construction and the frames set up for the third (80108). Among engines in the scrap roads, either being cut up or awaiting decision, were 67369 (C12), 67412 (C13), 65002 (J1), 65020 (J2), 65493/95 (J5), 68854/59 (J52), and 69437/82 (N1). A2/1 60507 (64B) was resplendent outside the paint 'shop after general repair. | SLS/195410 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/05/1944 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3696 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1930 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
08/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
04/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/07/1944. Dep: 28/07/1944. | ||
28/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/08/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944. | ||
10/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/10/1944. Dep: 07/11/1944. | ||
16/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
10/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 28/03/1945. | ||
04/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/06/1945. Dep: 28/06/1945. Work undertaken: Electric lighting fitted |
||
26/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 26/10/1945. Dep: 24/12/1945. Work undertaken: 8 wheel tender |
||
12/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 507 | ||
18/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/11/1946. Dep: 21/11/1946. | ||
29/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947. Work undertaken: Named HIGHLAND CHIEFTAIN |
||
19/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1947. Dep: 04/09/1947. | ||
14/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/10/1947. Dep: 28/11/1947. | ||
11/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1948. Dep: 29/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60507 |
||
17/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/12/1948. Dep: 15/01/1949. | ||
10/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1949. Dep: 12/10/1949. | ||
15/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
25/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/08/1950. Dep: 09/10/1950. | ||
24/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1951. Dep: 04/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29371 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/08/1952. Dep: 24/09/1952. | ||
04/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/08/1953. Dep: 21/08/1953. | ||
06/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/01/1954. Dep: 01/02/1954. | ||
09/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/02/1954. Dep: 02/03/1954. | ||
23/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1954. Dep: 26/08/1954. | ||
31/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/08/1954. Dep: 03/09/1954. | ||
04/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1956. Dep: 15/02/1956. | ||
16/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/05/1956. Dep: 02/06/1956. | ||
03/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/07/1956. Dep: 16/07/1956. | ||
29/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1957. Dep: 16/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29355 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1957. Dep: 21/11/1957. | ||
23/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/11/1957. Dep: 01/01/1958. | ||
05/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/08/1958. Dep: 09/08/1958. | ||
28/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/09/1958. Dep: 01/10/1958. | ||
06/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/03/1959. Dep: 12/03/1959. | ||
10/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1959. Dep: 16/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29371 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/12/1959. Dep: 24/12/1959. | ||
13/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
24/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 24/11/1960. Dep: 24/11/1960. | ||
12/12/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60507 from St Margarets (64A) |